EP4102122 - CONNECTOR AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING PIPES FOR TRANSPORTING FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P.E. S.r.l. Via Sant'Ambrogio 1,3,5 22070 Carbonate (CO) / IT | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVA, Giovanni 22070 CARBONATE (CO) / IT | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22178077.8 | 09.06.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | IT20210015377 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: IT202100015377 | [2022/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4102122 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4102122 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/091 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
F16L37/0915 (EP,US);
F16L37/091 (CN);
F16L33/035 (US);
F16L33/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON ROHREN ZUM TRANSPORT VON FLUIDEN | [2022/50] | English: | CONNECTOR AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING PIPES FOR TRANSPORTING FLUIDS | [2022/50] | French: | CONNECTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION DE TUYAUX POUR LE TRANSPORT DE FLUIDES | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19932602 (VOSWINKEL KG [DE]); | [Y]EP1146275 (COMAP SA [FR]); | [XY]WO2013056273 (LIVIZONE PTY LTD [ZA], et al); | [YA]WO2021101383 (WAVIN BV [NL]) |