Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
13.09.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
10.06.2022 | Change - representative |