EP4137764 - A RACKING SYSTEM FOR STORAGE ROOMS, STORAGE ROOMS WITH SAID RACKING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR ASSURING UNIFORM TEMPERATURE IN SAID STORAGE ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EHO d.o.o. Loznica pri Zalcu 59 3310 Zalec / SI | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pusnik, Andrej 3310 Zalec / SI | 02 /
Franaszek, Stanislaw 3310 Zalec / SI | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Patentni Biro AF d.o.o. Kotnikova 32, p.p. 2706 1001 Ljubljana / SI | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 22178118.0 | 09.06.2022 | [2023/08] | Priority number, date | EP20210192259 | 19.08.2021 Original published format: EP 21192259 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4137764 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/00, F25D17/06 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
F25D17/005 (EP);
F25D17/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGALSYSTEM FÜR LAGERRÄUME, LAGERRÄUME MIT DIESEM REGALSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERSTELLUNG EINER GLEICHMÄSSIGEN TEMPERATUR IN DIESEM LAGERRAUM | [2023/08] | English: | A RACKING SYSTEM FOR STORAGE ROOMS, STORAGE ROOMS WITH SAID RACKING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR ASSURING UNIFORM TEMPERATURE IN SAID STORAGE ROOM | [2023/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RAYONNAGE POUR SALLES DE STOCKAGE, SALLES DE STOCKAGE AVEC LEDIT SYSTÈME DE RAYONNAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSURER UNE TEMPÉRATURE UNIFORME DANS LADITE SALLE DE STOCKAGE | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/05] | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR101231928B (SINSEGAE FOOD CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,6,9,13 * abstract *[I] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [XI]JP5268172B (SUMMIT KOBE GODO BUSSAN KK) [X] 1,4,6,8-12,14 * abstract * [I] 13; | [XI]US10955186 (KENNEALLY KEITH A [US]) [X] 1,6,7,13,14 * abstract * [I] 2-4,9-11,15 | by applicant | EP0742887 | US5899084 |