Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP4131942

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
NL 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure25.02.2025Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 10
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 11
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 12
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 13
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 14
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 15
23.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 16
26.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 17
23.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 18
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 19
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 20
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:08.02.2023 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20220923
 
Event date:08.02.2023 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:3211884
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:08.02.2023 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2632152
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:08.02.2023 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1854287
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:08.02.2023 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:06.01.2023 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:06.01.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:01.02.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:06.03.2024 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20240131
 
Event date:04.09.2024 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:ADEIA GUIDES INC.