EP4105914 - CONTEXTUAL TRANSCRIPTION AUGMENTATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAPTHARISHI, Hariharan Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
BALADHANDAPANI, Gobinathan Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
P, Raghupathy Charlotte, 28202 / US | 04 /
KANAGARAJAN, Sivakumar Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22178408.5 | 10.06.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | IN202111026764 | 16.06.2021 Original published format: IN202111026764 | US202117412012 | 25.08.2021 Original published format: US202117412012 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105914 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G08G5/06 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0021 (EP);
G08G5/0052 (EP);
G08G5/065 (EP);
G08G5/0082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR KONTEXTUELLEN TRANSKRIPTIONSERWEITERUNG | [2022/51] | English: | CONTEXTUAL TRANSCRIPTION AUGMENTATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'AUGMENTATION DE LA TRANSCRIPTION CONTEXTUELLE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 09.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR3009759 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016155435 (MOHIDEEN MOHAMMED IBRAHIM [IN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]KR102003321B (ASIANA IDT INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2019244528 (SRINIVASAN NARAYANAN [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 20] , [0 34] , [0 35] , [0 40] , [0 45] , [0 47] , [0 49] , [0 51] - [0054] - [0 57]; figures 1-5 * |