EP4108535 - PROCESSING DEVICE, MOTORCYCLE, AND PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/52] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuzawa, Keiichiro Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 2248501 / JP | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22178427.5 | 10.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | JP20210104394 | 23.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021104394 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108535 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4108535 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W40/06, B60W50/14, B60W40/09 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B60W40/06 (EP);
B60W40/09 (EP);
B60W50/14 (EP);
B60W2300/36 (EP);
B60W2420/905 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/14 (EP);
B60W2520/18 (EP);
B60W2555/20 (EP);
B60W30/18109 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MOTORRAD UND VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/52] | English: | PROCESSING DEVICE, MOTORCYCLE, AND PROCESSING METHOD | [2022/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT, MOTOCYCLETTE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 28.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2828781 (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0022] , [0050]; claims 1,7,8 *; | [XI]DE102018213303 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0035] - [0037] - [0043] , [0052] - [0055] - [0059] , [0062]; claim 1 * [I] 8; | [A]US2020391559 (SUZUKI YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0073] , [0076]; claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2018118569 |