EP4109846 - PROCESSING INSTRUCTIONS TO CONFIGURE A NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESHMUKH, Raviraj Satish 411014 Pune / IN | 02 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Pradeep 560094 Bangalore / IN | 03 /
K, Varun S 577427 Shikaripur / IN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22178505.8 | 10.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | IN202141028389 | 24.06.2021 Original published format: IN202141028389 | US202117449617 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: US202117449617 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109846 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/082, H04L41/044, H04L41/08 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04L41/082 (EP);
H04L45/48 (CN);
H04L41/0813 (US);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
H04L41/0843 (US);
H04L45/02 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSANWEISUNGEN ZUR KONFIGURATION EINER NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | PROCESSING INSTRUCTIONS TO CONFIGURE A NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/52] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES INSTRUCTIONS POUR CONFIGURER UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 26.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US10044522 (SHAMIS MARK [US], et al); | [XI]EP3564808 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |