EP4293473 - OVERTURNING AND SUPPORTING ROTATING SHAFT FOR TABLET COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Zhongqiang Elite Electronic Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2, Longsheng Road Xincheng District Shilong Town Dongguan City, Guangdong Province / CN | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Songlin Dongguan City, Guangdong Province / CN | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22178566.0 | 13.06.2022 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293473 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04M1/04, H05K5/02 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP);
G06F1/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMDREH- UND TRAGENDE DREHWELLE FÜR EINEN TABLET-COMPUTER | [2023/51] | English: | OVERTURNING AND SUPPORTING ROTATING SHAFT FOR TABLET COMPUTER | [2023/51] | French: | RETOURNEMENT ET SUPPORT D'ARBRE ROTATIF POUR TABLETTE PC | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN207921105U (DONGGUAN SOCEN ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]CN211288434U (KUNSHAN VOSO HINGE INTELLIGENCE TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-4* the whole document * |