EP4079417 - AEROSOL GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stamford Devices Limited Galway Business Park Dangan H91 HE94 Galway / IE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACLOUGHLIN, Ronan H91 HE94 Galway / IE | 02 /
DUFFY, Conor H91 HE94 Galway / IE | 03 /
HOGAN, Brendan H91 HE94 Galway / IE | 04 /
KELLY, Patrick Martin H91 HE94 Galway / IE | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/43] | 01 /
MACLOUGHLIN, Ronan Galway, H91 HE94 / IE | ||
02 /
DUFFY, Conor Galway, H91 HE94 / IE | |||
03 /
HOGAN, Brendan Galway, H91 HE94 / IE | |||
04 /
KELLY, Patrick Martin Galway, H91 HE94 / IE | Representative(s) | Kiwit, Benedikt, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Weldon O'Brien Ltd. Shannon Lodge Casement Road Bandon County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE | Application number, filing date | 22179055.3 | 10.06.2016 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | EP20150171509 | 10.06.2015 Original published format: EP 15171509 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079417 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B17/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B05B17/0646 (EP,CN,US);
A61M11/003 (US);
A61M11/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNG | [2022/43] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATION | [2022/43] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 25.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16732528.1 / EP3307442 | EP21181812.5 / EP3922362 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2012092163 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [X]US2013334338 (HOGAN BRENDAN [IE]) | by applicant | US6235177 | US7066398 | US2007023547 | WO2012092163 | WO2013186031 |