EP4224860 - PROCESSING A TIME-VARYING SIGNAL USING AN ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORK FOR LATENCY COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited 5 Churchill Place, 10th Floor c/o Corporation Service Company (UK) Limited London E14 5HU / GB | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/32] | For all designated states iSize Limited 3 Falconet Court 123 Wapping High Street London E1W 3NX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHADHA, Aaron London / GB | 02 /
ANDREOPOULOS, Ioannis London / GB | 03 /
TREDER, Matthias London / GB | 04 /
LIM, Jia-Jie London / GB | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 22179065.2 | 14.06.2022 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | GR20220100125 | 08.02.2022 Original published format: GR 20220100125 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224860 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/42, H04N19/503, H04N19/85, G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04N19/503 (EP);
H04L43/0852 (US);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/049 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
H04N19/42 (EP);
H04N19/85 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITEN EINES ZEITVARIABLEN SIGNALS MIT EINEM KÜNSTLICHEN NEURONALEN NETZ ZUR LATENZKOMPENSATION | [2023/32] | English: | PROCESSING A TIME-VARYING SIGNAL USING AN ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORK FOR LATENCY COMPENSATION | [2023/32] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UN SIGNAL VARIANT DANS LE TEMPS À L'AIDE D'UN RÉSEAU DE NEURONES ARTIFICIELS POUR LA COMPENSATION DE LATENCE | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - DOULAMIS ANASTASIOS ET AL, "Content-based Video Adaptation in Low/Variable Bandwidth Communication Networks Using Adaptable Neural Network Structures", THE 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORK PROCEEDINGS, (20061030), URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=1716655&ref=aHR0cHM6Ly9pZWVleHBsb3JlLmllZWUub3JnL2RvY3VtZW50LzE3MTY2NTU=, (20221111), XP055980440 [X] 1,3-5,7,9-11,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8 [I] 2,6,12 | [YA] - KIM NAYOUNG ET AL, "Long-Term Video Generation with Evolving Residual Video Frames", 2018 25TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20181007), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2018.8451079, pages 3578 - 3582, XP033454654 [Y] 8 * abstract * * Sections 1 and 2 * [A] 1-7,9-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2018.8451079 | [A] - LEE JUNG-KYUNG ET AL, "Deep Video Prediction Network-ased Inter-Frame Coding in HEVC", IEEE ACCESS, IEEE, USA, (20200508), vol. 8, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2020.2993566, pages 95906 - 95917, XP011791138 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections I - III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2020.2993566 | [YA] - PENGLEI GAO ET AL, "Generalised Image Outpainting with U-Transformer", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20220127), XP091140367 [Y] 8 * abstract * * Sections 1 and 3 * [A] 1-7,9-15 |