EP4105302 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMBINED DRYING OF BIOMASS AND CAPTURE OF CARBON DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demmer Patent B.V. Van Raethof 8 7591 PW Denekamp / NL | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMMER, Johannes Jozef Denekamp / NL | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22179147.8 | 15.06.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | NL20211044066 | 15.06.2021 Original published format: NL 1044066 | [2022/51] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105302 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C10L5/44, C10L5/36 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
C10L5/442 (EP);
C10L5/363 (EP);
C10L2290/02 (EP);
C10L2290/06 (EP);
C10L2290/08 (EP);
C10L2290/30 (EP);
C10L2290/541 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOMBINIERTEN TROCKNUNG VON BIOMASSE UND ABSCHEIDUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID | [2022/51] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMBINED DRYING OF BIOMASS AND CAPTURE OF CARBON DIOXIDE | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LE SÉCHAGE DE LA BIOMASSE COMBINÉ AU PIÉGEAGE DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 21.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012042099 (TAHVANAINEN PAULI [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 13 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 11 - line 19 * * page 6, line 1 - line 12 *; | [A]WO2016118067 (BIOENDEV AB [SE]) [A] 1-14 * page 7, line 3 - line 32 * * page 12, line 2 - line 10 * * page 19, line 31 - page 20, line 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2019093938 (VALMET OY [SE]) [A] 1-14 * page 7, paragraph l - page 9, paragraph 2 * * figure - *; | [A]KR20200083880 (THE INDUSTRY & ACADEMIC COOPERATION IN CHUNGNAM NATIONAL UNIV (IAC) [KR]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0027] - [0038] - [0043] *; | [A] - Ten Asbroek Nick, "Frames Renewable Energy Solutions Introduction", (20190301), pages 1 - 26, URL: https://blueterra.nl/wp-content/uploads/2019/03/Frames-CO2-capture-from-biomass-combustion.pdf, (20220302), XP055898134 [A] 1-14 * page 10 - page 26 * |