EP4109138 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING CHARACTERISTIC INFORMATION OF GNSS SUBFRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 218 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34129 / KR | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jung Bin 34129 Daejeon / KR | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22179188.2 | 15.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | KR20210080107 | 21.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210080107 | KR20220062049 | 20.05.2022 Original published format: KR 20220062049 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109138 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/02, G01S19/24 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G01S19/02 (EP);
G01S19/243 (EP,CN);
G01S19/256 (CN,US);
G01S19/05 (US);
G01S19/11 (US);
G01S19/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON CHARAKTERISTISCHEN INFORMATIONEN EINES GNSS-UNTERRAHMENS | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING CHARACTERISTIC INFORMATION OF GNSS SUBFRAME | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DES INFORMATIONS CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE LA SOUS-TRAME GNSS | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 28.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006126762 (TAPUCU EMRE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2013141278 (RAO VYASARAJ GURU [IN]) [Y] 5-7,9,10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] , [0 76] , [0 84] *; | [XYI]WO2020059219 (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,11,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0 10] , [0 38] , [0 39] , [0049] , [0 65] - [0072]; figures 3,9,10; claim 1 * [Y] 5-7,9,10,14,15 [I] 4,13 |