EP4293721 - BIT CELL FOR SRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven KU Leuven Research & Development Waaistraat 6 Box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Hsiao-Hsuan 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
SALAHUDDIN, Shairfe Muhammad 3000 Leuven / BE | 03 /
CHAN, Boon Teik 3012 Wilsele / BE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22179216.1 | 15.06.2022 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293721 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/11, H01L27/02, H01L29/775, H01L23/528 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H01L27/0207 (EP);
H10B10/125 (EP,US);
H01L23/5286 (EP);
H01L29/0673 (EP);
H01L29/42392 (EP);
H01L29/775 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BITZELLE FÜR SRAM | [2023/51] | English: | BIT CELL FOR SRAM | [2023/51] | French: | CELLULE BINAIRE POUR SRAM | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2022052038 (LIEBMANN LARS [US], et al) [Y] 1-12* paragraphs [0048] - [0050] - [0 65] , [0 66]; figures 5, 6 *; | [Y]US2022102362 (CHANEMOUGAME DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0042] , [0049] - [0061]; figures 2, 4A-4C, 5B, 6A * |