EP4105296 - PROCESS FOR TREATING A GAS STREAM FROM PLASTIC PYROLYSIS AND / OR BIOMASS PYROLYSIS, AND INSTALLATION FOR INTEGRATION INTO A STEAM CRACKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/51] | METHOD FOR TREATING A GAS STREAM FROM PYROLYSIS OF PLASTIC AND/OR OF PYROLYSIS OF BIOMASS, AND INSTALLATION FOR INTEGRATION IN A STEAM CRACKER | ||
[2024/07] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip Energies France 2126 Boulevard de la Défense Immeuble Origine - CS 10266 92741 Nanterre Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | For all designated states Technip Energies France 2126 Boulevard de la Défense Immeuble Origine-CS 10266 92741 Nanterre Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICH, VERONIQUE 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | 02 /
SIMON, Yvon 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | 03 /
BRAGA, Walkiria 92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/16] |
Former [2022/51] | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22179277.3 | 15.06.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | FR20210006391 | 16.06.2021 Original published format: FR 2106391 | [2022/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105296 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4105296 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/10, C10B53/07, C10B53/02, C10K1/10, C10K1/00, C10K1/16, C10K1/18, B01D53/02, F25J3/08, B01D8/00, C10G21/14, B01D53/14, C10G9/36, C10G19/02, C10J3/84 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
C10G1/10 (EP);
C10K1/10 (EP,KR);
C07C7/11 (US);
B01D53/04 (US);
B01D53/1437 (EP);
B01D53/1456 (US);
B01D53/1487 (EP);
C07C7/10 (US);
C10B53/02 (EP);
C10B53/07 (EP);
C10G1/002 (KR);
C10G19/02 (EP);
C10G21/14 (EP);
C10G9/36 (EP);
C10J3/72 (KR);
C10J3/84 (EP);
C10K1/003 (EP,KR);
C10K1/04 (KR);
C10K1/121 (KR);
C10K1/122 (KR);
C10K1/165 (EP);
C10K1/18 (EP);
C10K1/32 (KR);
F25J3/0238 (US);
B01D2252/204 (US);
B01D2253/104 (US);
B01D2256/16 (EP);
B01D2256/245 (EP);
B01D2257/2025 (US);
B01D2257/302 (US);
B01D2257/406 (US);
C10G2300/1003 (KR);
C10G2300/1011 (KR);
C10J2300/0916 (KR);
C10J2300/0946 (KR);
F25J2205/30 (US);
F25J2205/50 (US);
F25J2205/60 (US);
F25J2210/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES GASSTROMS AUS KUNSTSTOFF-PYROLYSE UND/ODER BIOMASSE-PYROLYSE UND ANLAGE ZUR INTEGRATION IN EINEN STEAM CRACKER | [2024/07] | English: | PROCESS FOR TREATING A GAS STREAM FROM PLASTIC PYROLYSIS AND / OR BIOMASS PYROLYSIS, AND INSTALLATION FOR INTEGRATION INTO A STEAM CRACKER | [2024/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN FLUX GAZEUX ISSU DE LA PYROLYSE DE PLASTIQUE ET/OU DE LA PYROLYSE DE BIOMASSE, ET INSTALLATION VISANT À L INTÉGRATION DANS UN VAPOCRAQUEUR | [2022/51] |
Former [2022/51] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES GASSTROMS, DER AUS DER PYROLYSE VON KUNSTSTOFF UND/ODER DER PYROLYSE VON BIOMASSE HERVORGEHT, UND ANLAGE ZUR INTEGRATION IN EINEM DAMPFCRACKER | ||
Former [2022/51] | METHOD FOR TREATING A GAS STREAM FROM PYROLYSIS OF PLASTIC AND/OR OF PYROLYSIS OF BIOMASS, AND INSTALLATION FOR INTEGRATION IN A STEAM CRACKER | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2829401 (TECHNIP CIE [FR]); | [A]US2019367430 (BRUDER DAVID [DE], et al); | [I]US2020087143 (CHAUBET LUCIE [DE], et al) | by applicant | US9011578 |