EP4105385 - SLAB FOR CONSTRUCTION AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A SLAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technys Rail Lieu-Dit Sarré 18140 Sancergues / FR | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ménagé, Florent 18140 Sancergues / FR | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22179654.3 | 17.06.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | FR20210006473 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: FR 2106473 | [2022/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105385 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E01C5/06, E01C5/08, E01B3/40 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
E01C5/065 (EP);
E01B3/40 (EP);
E01C5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENPLATTE FÜR DEN BAU UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN BODENPLATTE | [2022/51] | English: | SLAB FOR CONSTRUCTION AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A SLAB | [2022/51] | French: | DALLE POUR LA CONSTRUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE DALLE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4513040 (LANKARD DAVID R [US]) [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document *; | [X]CN102561143 (UNIV HEHAI) [X] 1-5,9,13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2014094057 (CARBONLOC PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,2,6,7,13,14* the whole document *; | [XI]DE202017101111U (C B S TEAM-PROJEKTGESELLSCHAFT MBH [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 12; | [X]CN112458829 (GUANGDONG TENAISHI NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,10,11,13,14 * the whole document * |