EP4084476 - AFFINE MVP CANDIDATE LIST IN IMAGE CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jaeho 06772 Seoul / KR | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 22179843.2 | 10.09.2019 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | US201862729407P | 10.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729407 P | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084476 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/176, H04N19/54 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/105 (KR,RU,US);
H04N19/527 (KR);
H04N19/129 (RU,US);
H04N19/132 (KR,RU,US);
H04N19/137 (RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | AFFINE MVP-KANDIDATENLISTE IN DER BILDCODIERUNG | [2022/44] | English: | AFFINE MVP CANDIDATE LIST IN IMAGE CODING | [2022/44] | French: | LISTE DE CANDIDATS MVP AFFINE DANS LE CODAGE D'IMAGE | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19859025.9 / EP3700216 | Divisional application(s) | EP24198461.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018098063 (CHEN YI-WEN [US], et al); |