EP4102848 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Young-ick Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Chang-yong Yongin-si / KR | 03 /
JANG, Jong-hyuk Gunpo-si / KR | 04 /
HAN, Jea-hee Yongin-si / KR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22179986.9 | 18.10.2013 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | KR20120121659 | 30.10.2012 Original published format: KR 20120121659 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102848 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/443, H04N21/422, H04N21/426, H04N21/4223 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G06F1/3215 (EP,US);
G05F1/66 (KR);
H04N5/63 (US);
G06F1/3265 (US);
G06F1/3293 (EP,US);
G10L15/22 (US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2022/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13189365.3 / EP2728894 | EP17155722.6 / EP3182717 | EP20155668.5 / EP3684064 | EP22177952.3 / EP4075817 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5774859 (HOUSER PETER B [US], et al); | [Y]US6070140 (TRAN BAO Q [US]); | [Y]EP1341380 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); |