EP4109571 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHA, Jong Hwan 17113 Yongin-si / KR | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22180162.4 | 21.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | KR20210080560 | 22.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210080560 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109571 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/40, H01L33/44 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H01L33/405 (EP);
H01L27/156 (KR,US);
H01L33/382 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,KR);
H01L27/124 (KR);
H01L27/1248 (KR);
H01L33/40 (US);
H01L33/44 (EP);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2022/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3828930 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0048] - [0159] *; | [A]EP3828937 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 ** paragraphs [0097] - [0101] * |