EP4108881 - NOTCHED TUBBING CORNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Cordes tubes & seals GmbH & Co. KG Im Südfeld 3 48308 Senden / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höft, Heiko 21357 Barum / DE | 02 /
Schlautmann, Frank 48167 Münster / DE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Habbel, Ludwig Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 22180208.5 | 21.06.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | DE202120103313U | 21.06.2021 Original published format: DE 202021103313 U | [2022/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4108881 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGEKLINKTE TÜBBINGECKE | [2022/52] | English: | NOTCHED TUBBING CORNER | [2022/52] | French: | ANGLE DU CUVELAGE EN RETRAIT | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 27.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5660501 (HERWEGH NORBERT [CH]) [X] 1,2,7,9,10,12 * column 4, line 36 - line 41; figures 1,2,3 * * column 1, line 5 - line 11 * [Y] 8,11,13,14; | [XDI]DE202017103363U (CTS CORDES TUBES & SEALS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,7,9-12 * figures 8,10 * [I] 8,13,14; | [A]DE102018112777 (EIN SHEMER RUBBER LTD [IL]) [A] 1-14* figures 1-3 *; | [XI]CN111749719 (CN RAILWAY SIYUAN SURVEY & DES) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * abstract; figures 1,2,5 * [I] 5,6; | [Y]CN212837863U (SHANGHAI TUNNEL ENG CO LTD, et al) [Y] 8,11,13,14 * abstract; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE202017103363U |