EP4111874 - A DEVICE FOR CONVEYING SMOKING ARTICLES OR PARTS OF SMOKING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D S.p.A. Via Battindarno 91 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERIOLI, Michele 40133 Bologna / IT | 02 /
GAMBERINI, Giuliano 40133 Bologna / IT | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emmanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Frontoni, Stefano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22180450.3 | 22.06.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | IT20210016979 | 29.06.2021 Original published format: IT202100016979 | [2023/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111874 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4111874 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/32, A24C5/33, A24C5/47 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A24C5/327 (EP);
A24C5/326 (EP);
A24C5/33 (EP);
A24C5/478 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN VON RAUCHERARTIKELN ODER TEILEN VON RAUCHERARTIKEL | [2023/01] | English: | A DEVICE FOR CONVEYING SMOKING ARTICLES OR PARTS OF SMOKING ARTICLES | [2023/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT D'ARTICLES A FUMER OU DE PARTIES D'ARTICLES A FUMER | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4244250 (RUDSZINAT WILLY) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4408621 (SCHUMACHER PETER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5322157 (DAHLGRUEN ROLF [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 6, lines 3-35 * * figures 1-2 * |