EP4296798 - TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT INCLUDING A CHRONOGRAPH MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blancpain SA Le Rocher 12 1348 Le Brassus / CH | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENDEN, Mehdi 39220 Les Rousses / FR | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22180625.0 | 23.06.2022 | [2023/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296798 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04F7/08 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G04F7/08 (EP);
G04B13/00 (CN);
G04B19/02 (US);
G04B13/02 (CN);
G04F7/0804 (EP,US);
G04F7/0842 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UHRWERK MIT EINEM CHRONOGRAPHENMECHANISMUS | [2023/52] | English: | TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT INCLUDING A CHRONOGRAPH MECHANISM | [2023/52] | French: | MOUVEMENT D'HORLOGERIE COMPORTANT UN MÉCANISME DE CHRONOGRAPHE | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH703797 (RICHEMONT INT SA [CH]) [AD] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * claims 1-10 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP3324249 (NOGERAH SA [CH]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0049]; claims 1,11,12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]CH716841 (MONTBLANC MONTRE SA [CH]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051] * * claims 1-10 ** figures 3-8b * | by applicant | CH703797 |