EP4111950 - SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fondation A de Rothschild 29 rue Manin 75019 Paris / FR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBERFELD, Gilles 92380 GARCHES / FR | 02 /
BOURDILLON, Pierre Vincent Adrien 75004 PARIS / FR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 22180765.4 | 23.06.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | FR20210007149 | 01.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107149 | [2023/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111950 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/384 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/002 (EP);
A61B5/7465 (EP);
A61B2505/07 (EP);
A61B5/384 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/01] | English: | SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010115418 (WANG YULUN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,11-14 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0029] * * paragraph [0037] * * figure - * [I] 2,5-8,10; | [A]US2013325244 (WANG YULUN [US], et al) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0316] , [0322] *; | [A]US2020185112 (ASO MAKOTO [US], et al) [A] 8* paragraph [0028] *; | [A] - LANIEL SEBASTIEN ET AL, "Adding navigation, artificial audition and vital sign monitoring capabilities to a telepresence mobile robot for remote home care applications", 2017 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON REHABILITATION ROBOTICS (ICORR), IEEE, (20170717), doi:10.1109/ICORR.2017.8009347, pages 809 - 811, XP033141676 [A] 5,7,10 * pages 808-810 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICORR.2017.8009347 | [A] - ULATE-CAMPOS A ET AL, "Automated seizure detection systems and their effectiveness for each type of seizure", SEIZURE, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, (20160617), vol. 40, doi:10.1016/J.SEIZURE.2016.06.008, ISSN 1059-1311, pages 88 - 101, XP029661181 [A] 2 * pages 89-90 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.seizure.2016.06.008 |