EP4134495 - VERTICAL RAIL SLIDER AND MOBILE SHOWERHEAD HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujian Xihe Sanitary Ware Technology Co., Ltd. No. 253, South Road High-Tech Industrial Zone LunCang Town Nan'an QuanZhou, Fujian 362304 / CN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Xiaofa QuanZhou, 362304 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Xiaoshan QuanZhou, 362304 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhiwei QuanZhou, 362304 / CN | 04 /
DENG, Feiming QuanZhou, 362304 / CN | 05 /
DENG, Xiaoqing QuanZhou, 362304 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Qiqiao QuanZhou, 362304 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Argyma 14 Boulevard de Strasbourg 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 22180786.0 | 23.06.2022 | [2023/07] | Priority number, date | CN202110916076 | 10.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110916076 | [2023/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134495 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/06 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
E03C1/066 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKALER SCHIENENGLEITER UND MOBILER DUSCHKOPFHALTER | [2023/07] | English: | VERTICAL RAIL SLIDER AND MOBILE SHOWERHEAD HOLDER | [2023/07] | French: | COULISSEAU DE RAIL VERTICAL ET SUPPORT DE POMME DE DOUCHE MOBILE | [2023/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2691121 (GLOBE UNION IND CORP [TW]); | [XA]EP3581723 (RUNNER XIAMEN CORP [CN]) |