Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4083151 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4083151



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 244
03.01.2024 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.08.2023 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
07.08.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.08.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
07.08.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.08.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
07.08.2023 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 15
07.08.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.08.2023 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
07.08.2023 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
07.08.2023 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
07.08.2023 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
07.08.2023 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
07.08.2023 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
30.05.2023 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
02.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.05.2023 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.11.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.10.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
06.10.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.10.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2022 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 84
04.10.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 5
04.10.2022 European search report Search / examination 2
04.10.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.09.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
27.06.2022 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 11
23.06.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.06.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
23.06.2022 Claims Search / examination 2
23.06.2022 Description Search / examination 18
23.06.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
23.06.2022 Drawings Search / examination 12
23.06.2022 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
23.06.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
02.10.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19