EP4297037 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN INDICATOR OF PRESENCE OF HRD IN A GENOME OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seqone 22 Rue Durand 34000 Montpellier / FR | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILIPPE, Nicolas 34150 Gignac / FR | 02 /
BRUNEL, Samantha 34000 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
BEAUMEUNIER, Sacha 34540 Balaruc le vieux / FR | 04 /
DUFORET, Nicolas 34670 Saint Bres / FR | 05 /
RUZICKA, Jiri 34000 Montpellier / FR | 06 /
BERTAND, Denis 34400 Lunel / FR | 07 /
GOTTIN, Céline 34080 Montpellier / FR | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22181091.4 | 24.06.2022 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297037 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16B40/00, G16B20/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G16B20/10 (EP);
G16B40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES INDIKATORS FÜR DAS VORHANDENSEIN VON HRD IN EINEM GENOM EINES PROBANDEN | [2023/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN INDICATOR OF PRESENCE OF HRD IN A GENOME OF A SUBJECT | [2023/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UN INDICATEUR DE PRÉSENCE DE HRD DANS UN GÉNOME D'UN SUJET | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2020255909 (VENKAT AARTI [US], et al) [Y] 15 * p. 8, [0084] p. 8, [0087] p. 9, [0094] *; | [Y]CN113736878 (UNIV FUDAN SHANGHAI CANCER CT) [Y] 4 * Claim 3 *; | [XYI]US2022084626 (POZZORINI CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [X] 1 * p. 1, [0003] - [0004] p. 1, [0007] p. 2, [0010] p. 7, [0063] - [0064] p. 8, [0070] p. 9, [0074] p. 11, [0088] - [0089] p. 13, [0110] p. 14, [0119] p. 15, [0134] p. 16, [0168] p. 16, [1073] - [0174] p. 17, [0178] p. 17, [0192] p. 18, [0203] Figure 1 Figure 12 * [Y] 4,6,15 [I] 2,3,5,7-14,16; | [A] - HELEN DAVIES ET AL, "HRDetect is a predictor of BRCA1 and BRCA2 deficiency based on mutational signatures", NATURE MEDICINE, New York, (20170313), vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nm.4292, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 517 - 525, XP055386173 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.4292 | [Y] - EECKHOUTTE ALEXANDRE ET AL, "ShallowHRD: detection of homologous recombination deficiency from shallow whole genome sequencing", BIOINFORMATICS, GB, vol. 36, no. 12, doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btaa261, ISSN 1367-4803, (20200421), pages 3888 - 3889, (20221104), XP055857125 [Y] 6 * p3889, section 2.2.1 Workflow ii * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btaa261 | [A] - SZTUPINSZKI ZSOFIA ET AL, "Migrating the SNP array-based homologous recombination deficiency measures to next generation sequencing data of breast cancer", NPJ BREAST CANCER, doi:10.1038/s41523-018-0066-6, (20180702), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/s41523-018-0066-6.pdf, (20221104), XP055929025 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41523-018-0066-6 |