Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023002054 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217743700 | 13.05.2022 | US202163216561 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023008876 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202163216561 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115535253 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202163216561 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4112466 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163216561 | 30.06.2021 |