EP4113217 - TIMEPIECE PARTS AND TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJI, Tsubasa Suwa-shi, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
FURUSATO, Daiki Suwa-shi, 392-8502 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 22181196.1 | 27.06.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | JP20210106447 | 28.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021106447 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113217 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/12 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G04B19/12 (EP,CN,US);
C23C14/0015 (CN);
C23C14/08 (CN);
C23C14/081 (CN);
C23C14/083 (CN);
C23C14/10 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UHRENTEILE UND UHR | [2023/01] | English: | TIMEPIECE PARTS AND TIMEPIECE | [2023/01] | French: | PARTIES DE PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE ET PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 30.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6538959 (YAMAGUCHI KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* column 21, lines 26-36 *; | [XA]US2018217558 (FURUSATO DAIKI [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,10 * paragraphs [0172] - [0177] - [0185] , [0193] - [0204]; examples 1,3,5,6; table 1 * [A] 7,9; | [XA]JP2020034478 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0062] - [0067]; figure 10 * [A] 7 | by applicant | JP2018124267 | JP2018124268 | JP2018124269 | JP20210106447 |