EP4124175 - METHOD FOR ASSOCIATING A COOKING VESSEL, EVALUATION DEVICE AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENNEN, Volker 32257 Bünde / DE | 02 /
STAHL, Hermann 32289 Rödinghausen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Christoph 32289 Rödinghausen / DE | 04 /
WILKENS, Henrik 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 22181228.2 | 27.06.2022 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | DE202110118574 | 19.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021118574 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124175 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP);
H05B2213/05 (EP);
H05B2213/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUORDNEN EINES GARGEFÄSSES, AUSWERTEEINRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG | [2023/04] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSOCIATING A COOKING VESSEL, EVALUATION DEVICE AND APPARATUS | [2023/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFECTATION D'UN RÉCIPIENT DE CUISSON, DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION ET DISPOSITIF | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 25.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019209371 (MEYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10-14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0072]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0172]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0279]; figure 11 * * claim 1 * [I] 4,6-8; | [I]EP3606109 (SEB SA [FR]) [I] 1,9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0084]; figure 1 *; | [I]EP3111144 (SEB SA [FR]) [I] 1,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0042]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095]; figure 12 * * paragraph [0153]; figures 6,10 * | by applicant | US2019125120 | DE102018119969 |