EP4125169 - SUPERCONDUCTING CABLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 4, Allée de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELPLACE, Sébastien 59279 LOON-PLAGE / FR | 02 /
LALLOUET, Nicolas 62360 BAINCTHUN / FR | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 22181494.0 | 28.06.2022 | [2023/05] | Priority number, date | FR20210008138 | 27.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2108138 | [2023/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125169 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/34, H01F6/06, H01R4/68, // H01F6/04, H02G15/107, H02G15/22 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
H02G15/34 (EP);
H01R4/68 (EP,US);
H01B12/16 (US);
H02G15/107 (EP);
H02G15/22 (EP);
Y02E40/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] |
Former [2023/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPRALEITERKABELSYSTEM | [2023/05] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTING CABLE SYSTEM | [2023/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CÂBLE SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 01.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2178438 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 37 *; | [A]US2007137881 (ASHIBE YUUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * figures 2,3a,7 * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0104] *; | [A]US7296419 (SUZAWA CHIZURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 6 *; | [A]WO2011152344 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-5 ** paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046] *; | [XI]US2014027141 (YAGI MASASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,13,14 * figures 1,2,9-11 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0140] * [I] 12; | [XI]KR20190010028 (LS CABLE & SYSTEM LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] * [I] 12,14 |