EP4120513 - ELECTRICAL MACHINE WITH COOLING OF WINDING HEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 et 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states EREM ZA Sud Rue de la Sucrerie 60130 Wavignies / FR | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIB, Wissam 92852 RUEIL-MALMAISON CEDEX / FR | 02 /
GROSJEAN, Paul 92852 RUEIL-MALMAISON CEDEX / FR | 03 /
MAIER, Paul 60130 WAVIGNIES / FR | 04 /
MAIER, Vincent 60130 WAVIGNIES / FR | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22181658.0 | 28.06.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | FR20210007709 | 16.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107709 | [2023/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120513 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/20, H02K9/19, H02K3/24 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H02K9/19 (EP);
H02K1/20 (EP);
H02K3/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT KÜHLUNG DER WICKLUNGSKÖPFE | [2023/03] | English: | ELECTRICAL MACHINE WITH COOLING OF WINDING HEADS | [2023/03] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT DES TÊTES DE BOBINES | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19749108 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, lines 36-44; figures 1-3; claim 1 * * column 2, lines 48-51 *; | [Y]DE10131119 (SIEMENS LINEAR MOTOR SYSTEMS G [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 13]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2378642 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4,6-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 13]; figures 1, 4 *; | [Y]FR3059852 (IFP ENERGIES NOW [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figures 3-5; claim 14 *; | [Y]FR3071978 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [Y] 4 * page 6, lines 6-8 *; | [A]CN112290742 (NIDEC CORP) [A] 3* figure 3 * | by applicant | EP1057242 | DE102012221325 | FR3057719 |