EP4112681 - CABLE COMPRISING A FIRE-RESISTANT COMPACT SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 4, Allée de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARCHE, Jean-François 69250 Fleurieu-sur-Saône / FR | 02 /
JABIOLE, Aurore 69007 Lyon / FR | 03 /
DESMARS, Loriane 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 22182296.8 | 30.06.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | FR20210007181 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: FR 2107181 | [2023/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112681 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/3465, C08K5/3492, H01B3/44, H01B7/295, // C08K3/32, H01B9/00 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H01B3/441 (EP);
C08K5/3465 (EP);
C08K5/34922 (EP);
H01B7/295 (EP);
C08K2003/321 (EP);
C08K2003/323 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3465, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08K5/34922, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08K2003/321, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08K2003/323, C08L23/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABEL MIT EINEM KOMPAKTEN FEUERHEMMENDEN MANTEL | [2023/01] | English: | CABLE COMPRISING A FIRE-RESISTANT COMPACT SHEATH | [2023/01] | French: | CÂBLE COMPRENANT UNE GAINE COMPACTE RETARDANTE AU FEU | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012174712 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1 - page 38; examples IE1-IE7; claims 1-10; tables A-F *; | [I]CN105542305 (SHANGHAI JIEMIAN NEW MAT TECH CO LTD) [I] 14,15* examples 1,4-5; claims 1-10 *; | [I]EP3255095 (ADEKA CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095]; examples 1-5; claims 1-5 *; | [XI]WO2018138446 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-13 * examples 1-11; claims 1-15; tables 1-2 * [I] 14,15; | [X]EP3505595 (ADEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053]; tables 1-2 *; | [XI]EP3763784 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0100]; claims 1-17; tables 1-14 * [I] 14,15 | by applicant | EP1504887 |