EP4088741 - LIPOCATIONIC POLYMERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEGWART, Daniel J. Dallas, 75229 / US | 02 /
HAO, Jing Newberg, 97132 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Kejin Dallas, 75205 / US | 04 /
MILLER, Jason Dallas, 75206 / US | 05 /
KOS, Petra Dallas, 75235 / US | 06 /
XUE, Lian Dallas, 75235 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 22182315.6 | 08.12.2015 | [2022/46] | Priority number, date | US201462089066P | 08.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462089066 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088741 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/32, A61K31/713, A61K9/00, A61K47/22, A61K47/28, A61K47/34, A61K9/51, C08G63/91, C08G65/48, C12N15/113, A61K47/24, C08G63/688 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K47/24 (US);
A61K47/28 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/5153 (US);
C08G63/688 (US);
C08G63/912 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] |
Former [2022/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LIPOKATIONISCHE POLYMERE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/46] | English: | LIPOCATIONIC POLYMERS AND USES THEREOF | [2022/46] | French: | POLYMÈRES LIPOCATIONIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 15.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15866947.3 / EP3229842 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - JING HAO ET AL, "Rapid Synthesis of a Lipocationic Polyester Library via Ring-Opening Polymerization of Functional Valerolactones for Efficacious siRNA Delivery", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20150717), vol. 137, no. 29, doi:10.1021/jacs.5b03429, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9206 - 9209, XP055454059 [XP] 1-15 * Scheme 1 * * abstract * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.5b03429 | [A] - H. ELIYAHU ET AL, "Polymers for DNA Delivery", MOLECULES, (20050101), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.3390/10010034, pages 34 - 64, XP055481480 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/10010034 | [A] - ALICE E. VAN DER ENDE ET AL, "Approach to Formation of Multifunctional Polyester Particles in Controlled Nanoscopic Dimensions", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20080701), vol. 130, no. 27, doi:10.1021/ja711417h, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8706 - 8713, XP055481149 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja711417h | by applicant | US3687808 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4904582 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5112963 | US5118802 | US5130302 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5175273 | US5214136 | US5218105 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5272250 | US5292873 | US5317098 | WO9414226 | US5367066 | US5371241 | US5391723 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5451463 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5502177 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5541313 | US5545730 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5565552 | US5567810 | US5574142 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580731 | US5585481 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591584 | US5594121 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5608046 | US5614617 | US5645985 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5750692 | US5763588 | US5820873 | US5830653 | US6005096 | US6268490 | US2002168707 | US6506559 | US6525191 | US2003051263 | US2003055020 | US6573099 | US2003159161 | US6670461 | US6673611 | US2004019001 | US2004064842 | US6770748 | US2004171570 | US6794499 | WO2004106356 | US2004265839 | WO2005021570 | US2005130923 | US7034133 | US7053207 | WO2007134181 | US2007287831 | US2008039618 | US7399845 | WO2008101157 | US7427672 | WO2008150729 | WO2008154401 | WO2009006478 | WO2010141069 | US8450298 | - SRIVASTAVA et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070000), vol. 129, no. 26, pages 8362 - 8379 | - CHATTOPADHYAYA et al., J. Org. Chem., (20090000), vol. 74, pages 118 - 134 | - SINGH et al., Chem. Commun., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456 | - KOSHKIN et al., Tetrahedron, (19980000), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - WAHLESTEDT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20000000), vol. 97, pages 5633 - 5638 | - KUMAR et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19980000), vol. 8, pages 2219 - 2222 | - SINGH et al., J. Org. Chem., (19980000), vol. 63, pages 10035 - 10039 | - SRIVASTAVA et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070704), vol. 129, no. 26, pages 8362 - 8379 | - ELAYADI et al., Curr. Opinion Invens. Drugs, (20010000), vol. 2, page 5561 | - BRAASCH et al., Chem. Biol., (20010000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7 | - ORUM et al., Curr. Opinion Mol. Ther., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 239 - 243 | - FRIEDEN et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 6365 - 6372 | - FREIER et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19970000), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 4429 - 4443 | - ALBAEK et al., J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 7731 - 7740 | - LEUMANN, C J, Bioorg. & Med. Chem., (20020000), vol. 10, pages 841 - 854 | - LEUMANN, J. C, Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry, (20020000), vol. 10, pages 841 - 854 | - KABANOV et al., FEBS Lett, (19900000), vol. 259, pages 327 - 859 | - ENGLISCH et al., Angewandte Chemie, International Edition, (19910000), vol. 30, page 613 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 288 | - "Carbohydrate Modifications in Antisense Research", ACS Symposium Series 580, pages 40 - 65 | - LETSINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, page 6553 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19940000), vol. 4, page 1053 | - MANOHARAN et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 660, page 306 | - OBERHAUSER et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, page 533 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS et al., EMBO J, (19910000), vol. 10, page 111 | - SVINARCHUK et al., Biochimie, (19930000), vol. 75, page 49 | - MANOHARAN et al., Tetrahedron Lett, (19950000), vol. 36, page 3651 | - SHEA et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 3777 | - MANOHARAN et al., Nucleosides & Nucleotides, (19950000), vol. 14, page 969 | - MISHRA et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19950000), vol. 1264, page 229 | - CROOKE et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (19960000), vol. 277, page 923 | - JEROMELECOMTE, Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20080000), vol. 60, page 1056 | - POUNDERDOVE, A. Polym Chem-Uk, (20100000), vol. 1, page 260 | - TIAN et al., Prog Polym Sci, (20120000), vol. 37, page 237 | - WHITEHEAD et al., D. NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (20090000), vol. 8, page 129 | - LEE et al., Journal of Controlled Release, (20110000), vol. 152, page 152 | - PARMAR et al., Bioconjugate Chem, (20140000), vol. 25, page 896 | - TAN et al., Small, (20110000), vol. 7, page 841 | - ALBERTSSONVARMA, Adv Polym Sci, (20020000), vol. 157, page 1 | - AKINCW et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20080000), vol. 26, page 561 | - LOVE et al., Natl Acad Sci USA, (20100000), vol. 107, page 1864 | - SIEGWART et al., Natl Acad Sci USA, (20110000), vol. 108, page 12996 | - JAYARAMAN et al., Angew Chem Int Edit, (20120000), vol. 51, page 8529 | - SCHROEDER et al., Journal of Controlled Release, (20120000), vol. 160, page 172 | - NELSON et al., C. L. ACS Nano, (20130000), vol. 7, page 8870 | - LYNNLANGER, R., Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20000000), vol. 122, page 10761 | - ZUGATES et al., Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20060000), vol. 128, page 12726 | - GREEN et al., ACCOUNTS CHEM RES, (20080000), vol. 41, page 749 | - DAVIS et al., Nature (London, U. K., (20100000), vol. 464, page 1067 | - PHILIPP et al., Bioconjugate Chem, (20090000), vol. 20, page 2055 | - KIM et al., ACS Macro Letters, (20120000), vol. 1, page 845 | - COELHO et al., New Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 369, page 819 | - KANASTY et al., Nat Mater, (20130000), vol. 12, page 967 | - TEMPELAAR et al., Macromolecules, (20110000), vol. 44, page 2084 | - SILVERS et al., Polym Sci Pol Chem, (20120000), vol. 50, page 3517 | - ZIMMERMANN et al., Nature, (20060000), vol. 441, page 111 | - SEMPLE et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20100000), vol. 28, page 172 | - HAO et al., Current Organic Chemistry, (20130000), vol. 17, pages 930 - 942 | US19740609895 | US19950610269 | US19980610269 | US19640610565 | US19870610977 | US19440610998 | WO2008US64591 | US20080129154 | WO2008US66154 | WO2008US68922 |