blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4124471

EP4124471 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.11.2024
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.08.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.03.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.12.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 01.01.2025  [2025/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd.
6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken 651-0072 / JP
[2023/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Masumi
Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0072 / JP
02 / MIKI, Takashi
Kobe-shi, 651-0072 / JP
03 / MIAO, Dong
Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0072 / JP
04 / MISAKI, Momoka
Kobe-shi, 651-0072 / JP
05 / MISEKI, YUTA
Kobe-shi, 651-0072 / JP
 [2023/05]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2023/05]
Application number, filing date22182948.405.07.2022
[2023/05]
Priority number, dateJP2021012272027.07.2021         Original published format: JP 2021122720
[2023/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4124471
Date:01.02.2023
Language:EN
[2023/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4124471
Date:01.01.2025
Language:EN
[2025/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:B60C9/00, B60C9/20, B60C9/22
[2023/05]
CPC:
B60C9/2009 (EP); B60C2009/2067 (EP); B60C2009/2077 (EP);
B60C2009/2083 (EP); B60C2009/2247 (EP); B60C2009/2257 (EP);
B60C2009/2266 (EP); B60C9/0064 (EP); B60C9/22 (EP);
Y02T10/86 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/16]
Former [2023/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2023/05]
English:TIRE[2023/05]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2023/05]
Examination procedure14.03.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2023Examination requested  [2023/16]
14.03.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2024Fee for grant paid
26.11.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.11.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2015080972  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [I]US2018022159  (ASTAIX CAMILLE [FR], et al);
 [I]US2018022160  (ASTAIX CAMILLE [FR], et al)
by applicantJP2019177838
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.