Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.06.2024 | First examination report | |
06.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.06.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
09.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
05.07.2022 | Change - representative |