Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023008551 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT202100017858 | 07.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115593119 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | IT202100017858 | 07.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4116103 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT202100017858 | 07.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT202100017858 | 07.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT202100017858 | 07.07.2021 |