EP4116103 - MACHINE FOR PRINTING INFORMATION ON A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMI S.p.A. Via Monte Grappa, 7 24121 Bergamo / IT | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAVA, Angelo 24121 Bergamo / IT | 02 /
CHIESA, Fabio 24121 Bergamo / IT | 03 /
CORTINOVIS, Ivan 24121 Bergamo / IT | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 22183005.2 | 05.07.2022 | [2023/02] | Priority number, date | IT20210017858 | 07.07.2021 Original published format: IT202100017858 | [2023/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116103 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B65G33/02, B65G47/84, B41J11/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B41J3/4073 (EP,CN,US);
B41J3/4075 (EP,CN);
B41F17/08 (US);
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J3/40731 (EP,CN,US);
B65C9/46 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2023/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM DRUCKEN VON INFORMATIONEN AUF EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2023/02] | English: | MACHINE FOR PRINTING INFORMATION ON A CONTAINER | [2023/02] | French: | MACHINE D'IMPRESSION D'INFORMATIONS SUR UN RÉCIPIENT | [2023/02] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 21.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2013019566 (SCHACH MARTIN [DE]); | [XAI]US2016023459 (TILL HEINZ [DE]); | [Y]DE102014113720 (KHS GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2018264845 (GERTLOWSKI GEORG [DE], et al) |