EP4120741 - CONTROLLING SECONDARY CELL GROUP ADDITION AND RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICKISCH, Dirk Munich / DE | 02 /
SAMBHWANI, Sharad San Diego / US | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22183320.5 | 06.07.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | US202117377229 | 15.07.2021 Original published format: US202117377229 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120741 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04L5/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0035 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W36/00698 (EP,US);
H04W36/0094 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTROLLE DER HINZUFÜGUNG UND FREISETZUNG SEKUNDÄRER ZELLGRUPPEN | [2023/03] | English: | CONTROLLING SECONDARY CELL GROUP ADDITION AND RELEASE | [2023/03] | French: | CONTRÔLE DE L'AJOUT ET DE LA LIBÉRATION DE GROUPE DE CELLULES SECONDAIRES | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 12.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011041662 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); | [XI]WO2016191126 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [XI]US2019116585 (CHAKRABORTY KAUSHIK [US], et al); | [XI]US2020068645 (CHANG JUNREN [CN], et al); | [XI]WO2021016734 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); |