EP4120260 - IN-VEHICLE COMMUNICATION SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alps Alpine Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-otsukamachi Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | For all designated states Alps Alpine Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-otsukamachi Ota-ku Tokyo 1458501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tachi, Ryosuke Iwaki-city Fukushima / JP | 02 /
Taguchi, Hiroyuki Iwaki-city Fukushima / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22183438.5 | 06.07.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | JP20210116442 | 14.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021116442 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120260 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02, H04R1/40, H04R3/04, // G10L21/0216 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
G10L21/02 (EP);
B60R16/023 (CN);
H04R3/002 (US);
B60Q9/00 (CN);
H04R1/025 (US);
H04R1/323 (CN);
H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R3/04 (EP,US);
G10L2021/02165 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/03] | G10L21/02, H04R3/00, // G10L21/0216, B60R11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGINTERNES KOMMUNIKATIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/03] | English: | IN-VEHICLE COMMUNICATION SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2023/03] | French: | SYSTÈME EMBARQUÉ DE SUPPORT DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 03.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2002051392 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]WO0232356 (LEAR CORP [US]); | [A]US2011051951 (BURNETT GREGORY C [US]); | [A]US2017193976 (MOHAMMAD ASIF [US], et al); | [A]US2017251304 (HERBIG TOBIAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2020020315 (TACHI RYOSUKE [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH11234790 | JP2001142469 | JP2002051392 |