EP4047534 - TRAFFIC ACCIDENT DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Connectivity (Beijing) Technology Co., Ltd. 101, 1st floor, building 1, yard 7 Ruihe West 2nd Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Liping Beijing, 100176 / CN | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 22183757.8 | 08.07.2022 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | CN202110910277 | 09.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110910277 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4047534 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4047534 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q40/08, G06Q50/18, G06Q50/40, G06Q50/26, G07C5/00, G07C5/08, G08G1/01, H04W4/44 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G08G1/0104 (CN);
G06Q40/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/18 (EP);
G06Q50/26 (EP);
G06Q50/40 (EP);
G08G1/0112 (EP);
G08G1/0129 (EP);
G08G1/0133 (US);
G08G1/0175 (CN);
H04L67/1095 (CN);
H04L67/12 (CN);
H04L67/52 (EP,CN);
H04W4/44 (EP);
G07C5/008 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | G06Q10/10, G06Q50/30, G06Q40/08, G06Q50/18, G06Q50/26, G07C5/00, G07C5/08, G08G1/01, H04W4/44 | ||
Former IPC [2023/01] | G06Q10/10, G06Q50/30, G06Q40/08, G06Q50/18, G06Q50/26 | ||
Former IPC [2022/34] | G06Q10/10, G06Q50/30, G06Q40/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON VERKEHRSUNFALLDATEN, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2022/37] | English: | TRAFFIC ACCIDENT DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'ACCIDENTS DE LA CIRCULATION, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/34] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON DATEN EINES VERKEHRSUNFALLES, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND RECHNERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | ||
Former [2022/34] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES CONCERNANT UN ACCIDENT DE TRAFIC, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | Examination procedure | 08.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 07.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US11015942 (KONRARDY BLAKE [US], et al) [X] 10,14 * figure 1A * * column 11, lines 46-56 * * column 32, lines 15-67 * * column 34, lines 15-39,50-67 * * column 46, lines 53-67 * * column 47, lines 22-63 * * column 48, lines 22-38 * * column 49, lines 4-43 * [Y] 13 [I] 10-12,14,15; | [I]US11068995 (POTTER THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * column 4, lines 19-55 * * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 3 * * column 10, lines 29-45 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 11 *; | [A]US2021233554 (BUDDHADEV JUGAL [US], et al) [A] 6,7* paragraph [0015] *; | [Y] - MECACCI GIULIO ET AL, "Meaningful human control as reason-responsiveness: the case of dual-mode vehicles", ETHICS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10676-019-09519-W, ISSN 1388-1957, (20191119), pages 103 - 115, (20191119), XP037147271 [Y] 13 * page 113, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10676-019-09519-w |