EP4151630 - POLYMORPHS OF N-[(3-FLUORO-4-METHOXYPYRIDIN-2-YL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE AS KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalvista Pharmaceuticals Limited Porton Science Park Bybrook Road Porton Down Wiltshire SP4 0BF / GB | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEATON, Haydn Quorn Loughborough, LE12 8PF / GB | 02 /
CROWE, David Malcolm Reading, RG2 0NH / GB | 03 /
EDWARDS, Hannah Joy Porton Down, SP4 0JQ / GB | 04 /
GRIFFITHS-HAYNES, Nicholas James Pailton, CV23 0QC / GB | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 22183889.9 | 01.06.2017 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | GB20160009607 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: GB 201609607 | US201662344059P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344059 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151630 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/10, A61K31/4439, A61P29/00 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/4439 (IL,KR,RU);
C07D401/02 (IL,US);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P1/18 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/02 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/02 (EP,IL);
C07B2200/13 (IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 21.09.2023 | ME | 21.09.2023 | Validation states | MA | 21.09.2023 | MD | 21.09.2023 | Title | German: | POLYMORPHE VON N-[(3-FLUORO-4-METHOXYPYRIDIN-2-YL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOL-4-CARBOXAMID ALS KALLIKREIN INHIBITOREN | [2023/12] | English: | POLYMORPHS OF N-[(3-FLUORO-4-METHOXYPYRIDIN-2-YL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE AS KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS | [2023/12] | French: | POLYMORPHES DU N-[(3-FLUORO-4-METHOXYPYRIDIN-2-YL)METHYL]-3-(METHOXYMETHYL)-1-({4-[2-OXOPYRIDIN-1-YL)METHYL]PHENYL}METHYL)PYRAZOLE-4-CARBOXAMIDE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE KALLIKREIN | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 21.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17728614.3 / EP3464265 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012017020 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2013111108 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2014188211 (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]); | [XP]WO2016083820 (KALVISTA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]); | by applicant | WO9204371 | US5187157 | WO9429335 | WO9507921 | WO03076458 | WO2005123680 | WO2008016883 | WO2008049595 | WO2010142801 | WO2011118672 | WO2012004678 | WO2012009009 | WO2012017020 | WO2013111107 | WO2013111108 | WO2014108679 | WO2016083820 | WO2015GB53615 |