EP4306625 - CONCENTRATED WASHING AGENT COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vockenroth, Inga Kerstin 40227 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Sanchez Bastardo, Nuria 45147 Essen / DE | 03 /
Düffels, Arno 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22184038.2 | 11.07.2022 | [2024/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306625 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/37, C11D3/386, C11D17/04 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
C11D17/043 (EP);
C11D3/2044 (EP);
C11D3/2079 (EP);
C11D3/3723 (EP);
C11D3/38663 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/33] |
Former [2024/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERTE WASCHMITTELZUBEREITUNG MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2024/03] | English: | CONCENTRATED WASHING AGENT COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED PROPERTIES | [2024/03] | French: | PRÉPARATION CONCENTRÉE DE DÉTERGENT À DES PROPRIÉTÉS AMÉLIORÉES | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/33] | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0227195 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, lines 38-40; example 3; table 1 *; | [A]WO2017216215 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-15* claim -; table 1 *; | [Y]EP3974506 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [00 6]; claim -; table 1 *; | [A]WO2022063499 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 30 - line 35 * * page 2, paragraph vl - page 3, line 2; claim - * | by applicant | EP0817881 |