EP4307274 - METHOD FOR DETECTING DRIVING AGAINST A STATUTORY DIRECTION OF TRAVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peters, Steffen 14793 Buckautal / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22184176.0 | 11.07.2022 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307274 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G08G1/056, B60W30/095, B60W50/14, G01C21/36, G08G1/09, G08G1/0962, G08G1/0965, G08G1/0967 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G08G1/163 (EP);
G01C21/3697 (EP);
G08G1/056 (EP);
G08G1/094 (EP);
G08G1/09623 (EP);
G08G1/0965 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/34] |
Former [2024/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 17.07.2024 | ME | 17.07.2024 | Validation states | KH | 17.07.2024 | MA | 17.07.2024 | MD | 17.07.2024 | TN | 17.07.2024 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN DES FAHRENS GEGEN EINE GESETZLICHE FAHRTRICHTUNG | [2024/03] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING DRIVING AGAINST A STATUTORY DIRECTION OF TRAVEL | [2024/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CONDUITE EN SENS DE MARCHE LÉGAL INVERSE | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/34] | 17.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012036050 (AISIN AW CO [JP], et al) [A] 8* paragraphs [0003] , [0008] *; | [XI]US2015148987 (JESCHKE CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] - [0008] - [0014] - [0015] - [0018] - [0020] - [0026] * * figure 1 * [I] 2,5-8,10-13,15; | [A]US2017018178 (POECHMUELLER WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 5,6,11,15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 37] , [0 40] , [0 42] , [0 55] *; | [A]US2019279504 (GEISLER SIMON [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0044] *; | [I]US2022108605 (GHANNAM MAHMOUD YOUSEF [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0023] - [0024] - [0031] - [0033] - [0046] *; | [A]US2022185312 (HEGDE BHARATKUMAR [US], et al) [A] 6 * paragraph [0058] * | by applicant | DE102008046875 | DE102013009543 |