EP4130500 - BEARING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DRIVING BEARING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO (KOBE STEEL, LTD.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGAWA, Yusaku Hyogo, 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
OKITA, Keisuke Hyogo, 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
MATSUDA, Mariko Hyogo, 651-2271 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22184326.1 | 12.07.2022 | [2023/06] | Priority number, date | JP20210127008 | 02.08.2021 Original published format: JP 2021127008 | JP20220015976 | 03.02.2022 Original published format: JP 2022015976 | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130500 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4130500 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/10, F16C17/02, C10M101/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
F16C33/109 (EP);
C10M171/02 (EP);
F16C17/02 (EP);
C10N2030/02 (EP);
C10N2030/06 (EP);
C10N2040/02 (EP);
F16C2202/04 (EP);
F16C2210/04 (EP);
F16C2240/54 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] |
Former [2023/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LAGERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANTREIBEN DER LAGERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | BEARING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DRIVING BEARING DEVICE | [2023/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF PALIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF PALIER | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2017161003 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) | Examination | EP2159434 | by applicant | JP2004116707 | JP2017025396 |