EP4306210 - HIGH SURFACE AREA PCC AS A CATALYST CARRIER FOR PLATINUM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FTOUNI, Jamal 4800 Zofingen / CH | 02 /
DUTTA CHOWDHURY, Abhishek Wuhan, Hubei, 430072 / CN | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22184534.0 | 12.07.2022 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306210 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/18, B01J23/02, B01J23/62, B01J35/02, B01J35/10, B01J37/03, B01J37/08, B01J37/12, B01J37/14, B01J37/16, B01J37/18 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
B01J23/628 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP);
B01J23/02 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J35/613 (EP);
B01J37/031 (EP);
B01J37/035 (EP);
B01J37/038 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP);
B01J37/12 (EP);
B01J37/14 (EP);
B01J37/16 (EP);
B01J37/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PCC MIT GROSSEM OBERFLÄCHENBEREICH ALS KATALYSATORTRÄGER FÜR PLATINVERBINDUNGEN | [2024/03] | English: | HIGH SURFACE AREA PCC AS A CATALYST CARRIER FOR PLATINUM COMPOUNDS | [2024/03] | French: | PCC À SURFACE ÉLEVÉE EN TANT QUE SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR POUR COMPOSÉS DE PLATINE | [2024/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5856578 (SIEGRIST URS [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,13-17 * example -; claim -; table -; compound - * [I] 6-12; | [A]US2015165431 (BONRATH WERNER [CH], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]US2019262807 (GANE PATRICK A C [CH], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0268] - [0296]; example -; claim -; table - *; | [XD]WO2021058508 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [XD] 1-17 * 2. Material and equipment 3. Example Data;; claim -; table - *; | [X] - BLASER H-U ET AL, "The role of catalysis for the clean production of fine chemicals", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991206), vol. 189, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0926-860X(99)00276-8, ISSN 0926-860X, pages 191 - 204, XP004272056 [X] 1-5,13-17 * 3.1.1 Development of the new catalytic systems 3.1.2 Scope of the new systems 3.2 Lowering of hydroxylamine accumulation in the hydrogenation of aromatic nitro groups;; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(99)00276-8 | [X] - Roger Arthur Sheldon ET AL, "8 Catalytic Hydrogenation and Dehydrogenation 8.1 Alkynes", Fine Chemicals through Heterogeneous Catalysis, Weinheim, Germany, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH, (20001220), pages 351 - 471, doi:10.1002/9783527612963, ISBN 978-3-52-729951-5, XP055198635 [X] 1-5,13-17 * pages 399-403 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9783527612963 | by applicant | DE2704345 | WO2004030813 | EP2371766 | EP2447213 | EP2524898 | WO2013142473 | WO2013190076 | EP2840065 | WO2021058508 | - LINDLAR, H.DUBUIS, R., "Palladium Catalyst for Partial Reduction of Acetylenes", Organic Syntheses, (19660000), vol. 46, page 89 | - LINDLAR, H., "Ein neuer Katalysator fur selektive Hydrierungen", Helvetica Chimica Acta, (19520201), vol. 35, no. 2, doi:10.1002/hlca.19520350205, pages 446 - 450, XP002512759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19520350205 |