EP4177956 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yang 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
CHO, Nam Kyu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seok Hoon 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yong Seung 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
PARK, Pan Kwi 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
SHIN, Dong Suk 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
LEE, Sang Gil 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
LEE, Si Hyung 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22184956.5 | 14.07.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | KR20210151001 | 05.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210151001 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4177956 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4177956 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/66, H01L29/78 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/66795 (EP);
H01L29/785 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L27/0924 (CN,KR);
H01L29/7851 (US);
H01L29/0649 (US);
H01L29/0653 (EP);
H01L29/0673 (EP);
H01L29/0847 (EP,CN);
H01L29/16 (KR);
H01L29/41791 (EP,US);
H01L29/42392 (EP,KR);
H01L29/66439 (EP);
H01L29/775 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
H01L2029/7858 (CN);
H01L29/165 (EP);
H01L29/41766 (EP);
H01L29/516 (EP);
H01L29/78696 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2023/19] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2023/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 15.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2017154991 (KO YONGSUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3,5 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] * [A] 3-6,8-15[Y] 7; | [XAYI]US2017200718 (CHOI SUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8 * figures 1-38 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0099] * [A] 15 [Y] 7 [I] 3,4,6,9-14 |