EP4120529 - CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRIVE CONTROLLER AND POWER FACTOR CORRECTION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, 518043 / CN | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Jie 518129 Shenzhen / CN | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22184991.2 | 14.07.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | CN202110800307 | 15.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110800307 | [2023/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120529 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M1/42, H02M1/32 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H02M1/0009 (EP,US);
H02M1/4233 (CN,US);
H02M1/08 (US);
H02M1/088 (CN);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/4208 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR ANTRIEBSREGLER UND LEISTUNGSFAKTORKORREKTURSCHALTUNG | [2023/03] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DRIVE CONTROLLER AND POWER FACTOR CORRECTION CIRCUIT | [2023/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR CONTRÔLEUR D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET CIRCUIT DE CORRECTION DE FACTEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005007715 (MUKAI TATSUYA [JP], et al); | [A]US2011013436 (GAN HONGJIAN [CN], et al); | [A]US2018226877 (FUKUMOTO YOSUKE [JP]); | [XI]US2019326899 (NAKAMURA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) |