EP4310045 - OPERATOR ASSIST SYSTEM, WORKING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR ANNIHILATION OR AMPLIFYING OSCILLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Construction Equipment AB Bolindervägen 5 631 85 Eskilstuna / SE | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pause, Valentin 54329 Konz / DE | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22185630.5 | 19.07.2022 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310045 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/06, B66C1/58, B66C1/68 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
B66C13/063 (EP,CN);
B66C13/066 (EP,CN);
E02F3/435 (US);
B66C1/585 (EP);
B66C1/68 (EP);
B66C13/16 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENERASSISTENZSYSTEM, ARBEITSMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFHEBEN ODER VERSTÄRKEN VON SCHWINGUNGEN | [2024/04] | English: | OPERATOR ASSIST SYSTEM, WORKING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR ANNIHILATION OR AMPLIFYING OSCILLATION | [2024/04] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE À L'OPÉRATEUR, MACHINE DE TRAVAIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANNIHILATION OU D'AMPLIFICATION DES OSCILLATIONS | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 24.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1174384 (TIMBERJACK OY [FI]) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023] ** figure - *; | [XDI]EP3428110 (CARGOTEC PATENTER AB [SE]) [XD] 1,5,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0050] * * figure - * [I] 2,4,6,9,10,14,15 | by applicant | DE102018005068 | EP3428110 |