EP4123600 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A PARTICLE IN A CONTAINER FILLED WITH LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTENA GMBH Zollhallenstr. 5 79106 Freiburg / DE | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUTSCHAM, Lena 79106 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
MORONI, Riko 79106 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
SIBER, Clara 79106 Freiburg / DE | 04 /
RIBA, Julian 79106 Freiburg / DE | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Grabovac, Dalibor AAP Patentanwaltskanzlei Grabovac Pfeivestlstr. 12 81243 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | Grabovac, Dalibor AAP Patentnanwaltskanzlei Grabovac Pfeivestlstr. 12 81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22185882.2 | 20.07.2022 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | LU20210500454 | 20.07.2021 Original published format: LU 500454 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123600 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/69, G01N21/27, G01N35/10 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G06V20/693 (EP);
G01N35/1016 (US);
B01L3/0268 (US);
G01N15/1429 (EP);
G01N15/1433 (EP);
G01N15/1434 (EP);
B01L2200/0647 (US);
G01N2015/1006 (EP);
G01N2015/1445 (EP);
G01N2015/1486 (EP);
G01N2035/0401 (US);
G01N2035/1025 (US);
G01N2035/1058 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN EINES PARTIKELS IN EINEM MIT FLÜSSIGKEIT GEFÜLLTEN BEHÄLTNIS | [2023/04] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING A PARTICLE IN A CONTAINER FILLED WITH LIQUID | [2023/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE PARTICULE DANS UN RÉCIPIENT REMPLI DE LIQUIDE | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 08.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3260870 (CYTENA GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2020057880 (MIZUTANI TAKAYUKI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0285] ** paragraph [0652] - paragraph [0654] * |