EP4310454 - ROTATION RATE OFFSET COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veoneer Sweden Safety Systems AB Box 13089 10302 Stockholm / SE | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN SAID, Hela 95800 Cergy-Pontoise / FR | 02 /
LOISY, Aurore 95800 Cergy-Pontoise / FR | 03 /
LEMERRER, Yann 95800 Cergy-Pontoise / FR | 04 /
DEVAVRY, Arnaud 95800 Cergy-Pontoise / FR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Prüfeninger Straße 21 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/04] | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Stromerstr. 2A 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 22186145.3 | 21.07.2022 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310454 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01C25/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G01C25/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHRATENVERSATZKOMPENSATION | [2024/04] | English: | ROTATION RATE OFFSET COMPENSATION | [2024/04] | French: | COMPENSATION DE DÉCALAGE DE VITESSE DE ROTATION | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5297028 (ISHIKAWA MASATAKA [US]) [X] 1,15,16 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 16; figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 26 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 23 *; | [X]US6738721 (DRUECKE PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,15,16 * column 1, lines 17-26; figures 1-3; claim 1 * * column 1, line 41 - line 45 ** column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 60 *; | [X]DE102008041451 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0008] - [0015] - [0022] - [0038] - [0048]; figures 1-4 * |