EP4310483 - COLOR READING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Degenring, Daniela Sabine Jutta 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Robert 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | 03 /
Schunda, Eric 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22186203.0 | 21.07.2022 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310483 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/78 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G01N21/78 (EP);
G01N21/8483 (EP);
G01N2021/7759 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/34] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBLESEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/04] | English: | COLOR READING DEVICE | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE DE COULEUR | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/34] | 15.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7262061 (PETRICH WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * * column 2, lines 18-21 * * column 2, lines 59-61 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 20 * * column 5, line 56 - column 7, line 52 * * column 8, lines 18-34 * [I] 2,3,5-8,11; | [XI]US2018017498 (TSAI TUNGMENG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] - [0053] - [0062] - [0095] *[I] 3,7-11 |